House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1836 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1081 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2463 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 450 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |