House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2042
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2042
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1839
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1185
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1190
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1190
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1190
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1190
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1040
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 850
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2042
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 450
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|