House | 05/18/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 4044 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4044 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2334 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Schwertner | Journal Page: 1326 |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1326 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1325 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4044 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 452 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |