Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB156 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 3, 2023
Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill March 16, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 14, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note March 11, 2023