House | 04/17/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1529 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1529 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1468 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 960 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 957 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 892 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1529 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 455 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |