E | 05/19/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/19/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
E | 05/08/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1657 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3466 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1635 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1597 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1550 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2801 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Record vote | RV#913 | Journal Page: 2800 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2800 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2800 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2783 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | RV#906 | Journal Page: 2782 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2782 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2782 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2048 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 1388 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1388 | |
House | 04/06/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1283 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 783 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 783 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 783 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 782 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 782 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 782 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 782 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 767 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Considered by subcommittee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres | Journal Page: 455 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |