Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1563 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/30/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 1563
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Subcommittee on Higher Education;
 March 30, 2023, reported favorably from Committee on Education by
 the following vote:  Yeas 12, Nays 0; March 30, 2023, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of Sam Houston State University to
 receive formula funding for the Sam Houston State University
 College of Osteopathic Medicine.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 96.66(h), Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *