Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1568 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 28, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 5, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 27, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 27, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 28, 2023