Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1577 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 29, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 6, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis July 19, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 19, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note March 28, 2023