Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB158 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 28, 2023
Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 17, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 29, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis July 5, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 5, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 29, 2023
Fiscal Note March 18, 2023