Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1584 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/08/2023

                    By: Hall S.B. No. 1584
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 May 8, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 8, 2023, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1584 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain autologous and direct blood donations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 162, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 162.021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 162.021.  AUTOLOGOUS OR DIRECT BLOOD DONATION. (a)  A
 blood bank that facilitates autologous or direct blood donations
 shall comply with a physician's order prescribing for an individual
 an autologous or direct blood donation.
 (b)  A blood bank may charge a fee in an amount reasonable and
 necessary to cover the administrative cost to the blood bank of
 facilitating an autologous or direct blood donation ordered by a
 physician under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 241, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 241.013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 241.013.  AUTOLOGOUS AND DIRECT BLOOD DONATIONS. A
 hospital licensed under this chapter shall allow an individual on
 whom a medical procedure is to be performed to provide an autologous
 or direct blood donation ordered by a physician for the medical
 procedure if:
 (1)  the hospital facilitates blood donations; and
 (2)  not less than 72 hours before the time the medical
 procedure is scheduled to be performed, the individual:
 (A)  notifies the hospital of the individual's
 intention to provide an autologous or direct blood donation for the
 medical procedure; and
 (B)  for a direct blood donation, provides the
 hospital a list of eligible blood donors.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *