Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1584 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 28, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 8, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023
Analysis April 28, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note May 1, 2023