House | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1447 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 905 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 904 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 904 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 904 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 904 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 West | Journal Page: 903 |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 903 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 903 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 903 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Amendment adopted as amended | FA1 Huffman | Journal Page: 879 |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 879 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Amendment amended | Journal Page: 879 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Amendment to amendment offered | FA2 Huffman | Journal Page: 879 |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hughes | Journal Page: 877 |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 877 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 876 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Considered by subcommittee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred to s/c on Higher Education | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1924 | |
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 374 | |
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |