Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB16 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2023

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 16
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2023; March 13, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; March 30, 2023,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 3; March 30, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 16 By:  Middleton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the purpose of public institutions of higher education
 and a prohibition on compelling students enrolled at those
 institutions to adopt certain beliefs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 3, Education Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 50 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 50. HIGHER EDUCATION PURPOSE
 Sec. 50.001.  HIGHER EDUCATION PURPOSE. A public
 institution of higher education must be committed to creating an
 environment of:
 (1)  intellectual inquiry and academic freedom so that
 all students are equipped for participation in the workforce and
 the betterment of society; and
 (2)  intellectual diversity so that all students are
 respected and educated regardless of race, sex, or ethnicity or
 social, political, or religious background or belief.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.982 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.982.  PROHIBITION ON COMPELLING CERTAIN
 BELIEFS.  (a)  In this section, "institution of higher education"
 has the meaning assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  A faculty member of an institution of higher education
 may not compel or attempt to compel a student enrolled at the
 institution to adopt a belief that any race, sex, or ethnicity or
 social, political, or religious belief is inherently superior to
 any other race, sex, ethnicity, or belief.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *