House | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1925 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1925 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1634 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1017 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1017 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1017 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1016 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1016 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1016 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 994 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 957 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 852 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1925 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 458 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |