Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1614 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 22, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 5, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 21, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note April 2, 2023