E | 05/19/2023 | Vetoed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Senate adopts resolution recalling from Gov. | SCR 55 | Journal Page: 2235 |
E | 05/08/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1657 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3466 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1635 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1607 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2925 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Record vote | RV#996 | Journal Page: 2925 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2925 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2925 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2854 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2854 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 4857 | Journal Page: 2854 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 2333 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2333 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2191 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1311 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1297 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Zaffirini | Journal Page: 1278 |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1278 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1278 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2333 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 459 | |
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |