House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1791
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1185
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1101
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1101
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1101
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1101
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1101
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1101
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1101
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 461
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|