House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2461 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2461 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1835 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1184 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1079 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1038 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 956 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 852 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2461 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 159 | |
Senate | 11/14/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |