House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2337 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1401 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2463 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 462 | |
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |