E | 05/19/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/19/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
E | 05/09/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1697 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3710 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1663 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1632 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3260 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3253 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1176 | Journal Page: 3260 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3260 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3260 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3233 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3233 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3576 | Journal Page: 3233 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2337 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1401 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2463 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 462 | |
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |