Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1659 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 2, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 3, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis July 19, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis July 19, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 2, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 11, 2023
Fiscal Note April 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023