Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1663 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 27, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 4, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 5, 2023
Witness List

Analysis

Analysis May 4, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 24, 2023