Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1709 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 21, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 4, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 21, 2023