Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1712 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 14, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 26, 2023
Analysis April 25, 2023
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis July 18, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 18, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 25, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023