Senate | 04/04/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 658 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 617 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 487 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 487 | |
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |