E | 05/29/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/29/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3308 | |
E | 05/17/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2066 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4550 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2010 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1988 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1952 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4348 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Record vote | RV#1739 | Journal Page: 4347 |
House | 05/16/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4347 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4347 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4269 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4269 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1833 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1833 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1101 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1101 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1101 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1101 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1101 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1101 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1101 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 852 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1833 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 488 | |
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |