E | 05/23/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/23/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2543 | |
E | 05/11/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1817 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4045 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1787 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1751 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1707 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3505 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3508 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1308 | Journal Page: 3508 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3508 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3508 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3479 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3479 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3417 | Journal Page: 3479 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3713 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2337 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1401 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2463 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 489 | |
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |