Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1778 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/17/2023

                    By: Alvarado S.B. No. 1778
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2023; March 20, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture & Rural
 Affairs; April 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the process for initiating, transferring, or
 terminating water or sewer service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 13, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 13.152 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.152.  INITIATION, TRANSFER, OR TERMINATION OF
 SERVICE.  A retail public utility may initiate, transfer, or
 terminate a customer's retail water or sewer service on receipt of a
 customer request by mail, by telephone, through an Internet
 website, or through another electronic transmission.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *