LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1780
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1780
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1780
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/11/2023
9:00 am
State Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
Senate Chamber
SB1780
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
SB1606
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1624
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB997
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB2120
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1617
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 25 2023 5:13PM
SB1044
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Referred to Elections: Apr 28 2023 2:39PM
SB1131
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
SB2258
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23