House | 05/23/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4835 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 4044 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4044 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4047 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1596 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4044 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 490 | |
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |