E | 05/19/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/19/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
E | 05/09/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1697 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3710 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1663 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1633 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3266 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3253 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1176 | Journal Page: 3266 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3266 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3266 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3247 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3247 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2195 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 1301 | |
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1301 | |
House | 04/06/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1283 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 783 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 783 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 783 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 783 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 783 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 783 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 783 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 706 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1301 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 494 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |