Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1835 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 28, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 5, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023