House | 05/12/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 4044 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4044 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4047 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1762 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4044 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 494 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |