Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1849 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 27, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 9, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 4, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 14, 2023
Bill May 20, 2023
Bill May 19, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 14, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note April 23, 2023
Fiscal Note April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023