Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1850 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 11, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 2, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 13, 2023
Bill May 15, 2023
Bill May 15, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note April 30, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023