House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4834
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 3344
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3344
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1552
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1552
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 1552
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1552
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1552
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1594
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1489
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1400
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3344
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 496
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|