House | 05/23/2023 | Postponed | 7/4/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 5101 |
House | 05/23/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 5101 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4963 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4997 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1788 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1788 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1708 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1031 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1031 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1031 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1030 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1030 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Hughes | Journal Page: 1030 |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1030 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Hughes | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1030 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1029 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1029 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 883 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1788 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |