House
|
05/23/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1989
|
Journal Page: 5050
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Failed to pass
|
|
Journal Page: 5050
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5050
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4937
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1963
|
Journal Page: 4936
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4936
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended
|
2-Reynolds
|
Journal Page: 4936
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4935
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4609
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2334
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1401
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 161
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|