Senate | 05/15/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1923 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 498 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 498 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |