House | 05/23/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4835 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1300 | |
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1300 | |
House | 03/30/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 685 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 665 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 665 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 683 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 424 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1300 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1300 | |
Senate | 11/14/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |