LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1914
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1914
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1914
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/05/2023
8:00 am
Transportation Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.016
SB528
Introduced
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB790
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2023 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 14 2023 11:51AM
SB1370
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Referred to Transportation: May 5 2023 5:18PM
SB1387
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 12 2023 3:12PM
SB1495
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1524
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
SB1914
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective immediately
SB2102
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB2144
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB2221
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective immediately