Senate | 04/11/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 502 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 502 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |