E | 06/02/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 06/02/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3308 | |
E | 05/19/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4827 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2130 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2138 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4581 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Record vote | RV#1825 | Journal Page: 4580 |
House | 05/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4580 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4580 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4581 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Record vote | RV#1797 | Journal Page: 4470 |
House | 05/17/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4470 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4470 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 3063 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3063 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Record vote | RV#1825 | Journal Page: 4580 |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4580 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4470 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2194 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Creighton | Journal Page: 1336 |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1336 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3063 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 503 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |