House
|
05/23/2023
|
Postponed
|
6/1/23 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 5118
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 8, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 5118
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Amended
|
2-Kuempel
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1431
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1431
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1431
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1431
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1431
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1431
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1431
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1238
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered by subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Considered by subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 523
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|