House | 05/06/2023 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 3344 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3344 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2790 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1491 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1482 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1482 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1482 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1482 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1482 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1427 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1427 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 852 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3344 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 524 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |