LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB2
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB2
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB2
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
02/27/2023
11:00 am
State Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
Senate Chamber
SB2
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Referred to Elections: Apr 10 2023 3:28PM
SB599
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SCR17
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 10 2023 3:28PM
SB559
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
SB578
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23