E | 06/18/2023 | Vetoed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3310 | |
E | 05/19/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4827 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2130 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2138 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4582 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Record vote | RV#1826 | Journal Page: 4581 |
House | 05/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4581 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4581 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4471 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4471 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3468 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1301 | |
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1301 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1047 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 770 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 636 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1301 | |
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 375 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |