Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2014 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 22, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 31, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 13, 2023
Fiscal Note March 30, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023