E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/23/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4980
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2327
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2249
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4644
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1845
|
Journal Page: 4644
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4644
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4644
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4629
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4629
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2340
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1401
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1386
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1386
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1386
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1386
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1386
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1386
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1386
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1238
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 526
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|